This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 09:29:55 (UTC).

ULRICH, DYLAN Et Al VS SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/22/2017 ULRICH, DYLAN filed an Other lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ULRICH, MICHELLE

ULRICH, DYLAN

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

KRAPF, ALISON

BENNETT, RYAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

1/9/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY

1/9/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY

DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/6/2017: DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/2/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

9/28/2017: PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017081041

8/22/2017: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017081041

NOTICE-INTERROGATORIES

8/22/2017: NOTICE-INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 08/22/2017

8/22/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 08/22/2017

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

8/22/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

EXHIBIT F

8/22/2017: EXHIBIT F

EXHIBIT E

8/22/2017: EXHIBIT E

EXHIBIT D

8/22/2017: EXHIBIT D

EXHIBIT C

8/22/2017: EXHIBIT C

EXHIBIT B

8/22/2017: EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A

8/22/2017: EXHIBIT A

COMPLAINT

8/22/2017: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/22/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/22/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017081041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less