This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 15:08:15 (UTC).

TSIOGAS, JIM VS THE ESTATE OF STEPHEN JORDAN C/O LAURIE ANN JORDAN AND ALL HEIRS

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 TSIOGAS, JIM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THE ESTATE OF STEPHEN JORDAN C/O LAURIE ANN JORDAN AND ALL HEIRS. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSIOGAS, JIM

Defendant

THE ESTATE OF STEPHEN JORDAN C/O LAURIE ANN JORDAN AND ALL HEIRS

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018013679)

2/1/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018013679)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/1/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION - DISMISS

12/14/2017: MOTION - DISMISS

COMPLAINT - AMENDED

11/13/2017: COMPLAINT - AMENDED

RECEIPT # 2017096972 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

10/31/2017: RECEIPT # 2017096972 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

SUMMONS SERVED - LAURIE ANN JORDAN ESTATE OF STEPHEN JORDAN AND ALL HEIRS

10/20/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - LAURIE ANN JORDAN ESTATE OF STEPHEN JORDAN AND ALL HEIRS

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC

10/16/2017: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

10/16/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/16/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017096972

10/16/2017: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017096972

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2018
  • HearingTime:10:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018013679)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 1 2018 10:15AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT # 2017096972 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - LAURIE ANN JORDAN ESTATE OF STEPHEN JORDAN AND ALL HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$450.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - FWD TO SSO WITH FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017096972

    Read MoreRead Less