This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 05:21:34 (UTC).

TRI-PAR ESTATES PARK AND RECREATION DISTRICT VS CRARY, VIRGINIA

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 TRI-PAR ESTATES PARK AND RECREATION DISTRICT filed an Other lawsuit against CRARY, VIRGINIA. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRI-PAR ESTATES PARK AND RECREATION DISTRICT

Defendant

CRARY, VIRGINIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOYETTE, DAVID

DAIGNEAULT, JAY

Defendant Attorney

DARVILLE, WYNDEL

 

Court Documents

MOTION - REINSTATE ACCESS AND USE RIGHTS, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

12/18/2018: MOTION - REINSTATE ACCESS AND USE RIGHTS, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/9/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ANSWER - TO AMENDED COUNTER-CLAIM

10/18/2018: ANSWER - TO AMENDED COUNTER-CLAIM

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - DARYLE VON HOLDT, TRUSTEE

10/15/2018: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - DARYLE VON HOLDT, TRUSTEE

LIST - WITNESS AND EXHIBIT - AMENDED

10/12/2018: LIST - WITNESS AND EXHIBIT - AMENDED

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION ORAL EXAMINATION AND SUBPOENA

10/10/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION ORAL EXAMINATION AND SUBPOENA

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION DEPOSITION

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION DEPOSITION

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES-SECOND NOTICE

3/19/2018: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES-SECOND NOTICE

MOTION - DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM

1/30/2018: MOTION - DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM

MOTION - LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM - PLAINTIFF

6/6/2019: MOTION - LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM - PLAINTIFF

EVIDENCE RECORD #42446 - PLAINTIFF

11/9/2018: EVIDENCE RECORD #42446 - PLAINTIFF

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - GEORGIA WOS

10/15/2018: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - GEORGIA WOS

LIST - WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

10/12/2018: LIST - WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

ORDER SCHEDULING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND DEADLINES

8/30/2018: ORDER SCHEDULING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND DEADLINES

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/3/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

1/22/2018: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

10/27/2017: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

10/2/2017: MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - AMENDED - TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM - TRI-PAR ESTATES PARK AND RECREATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED CRAIG CRARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CORRECT ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 10 2019 11:00AM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILE ANSWER, DEFENSES AND COUNTER-CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$805.00; Amount Paid:$805.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017068867

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-VIRGINIA CRARY - ISSUED 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less