This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/23/2022 at 18:03:19 (UTC).

TOSO, DENNIS Et Al VS WALMART MARKET #7221

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 TOSO, DENNIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART MARKET 7221. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOSO, DORIS

TOSO, DENNIS

Defendant

WALMART MARKET #7221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON, CALVIN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

7/23/2022: COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

7/23/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - WALMART MARKET #7221 - ISSUED 7/25/2022

7/23/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - WALMART MARKET #7221 - ISSUED 7/25/2022

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022065711

7/25/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022065711

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

7/26/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM D; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 11/04/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN D , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022065711

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - WALMART MARKET #7221 - ISSUED 7/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALVIN ROBINSON