This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:34:13 (UTC).

THURSTON, PHILLIP VS UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 THURSTON, PHILLIP filed an Other lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THURSTON, PHILLIP

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLI, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

10/15/2020: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

10/13/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020075740

9/25/2020: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020075740

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/24/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/24/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

9/24/2020: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -ISSUED ON 09-25-2020

9/24/2020: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -ISSUED ON 09-25-2020

COMPLAINT

9/24/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/24/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020075740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -ISSUED ON 09-25-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less