This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/28/2022 at 18:18:12 (UTC).

THE WRIGHTWAY EMERGENCY WATER REMOVAL LLC VS FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 THE WRIGHTWAY EMERGENCY WATER REMOVAL LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE WRIGHTWAY EMERGENCY WATER REMOVAL LLC

Defendant

FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BATTISTI, STEVEN ITALO

Defendant Attorney

ZINOBER, FREDRIC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT- & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/12/2018: COMPLAINT- & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/12/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

EXHIBIT- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/12/2018: EXHIBIT- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EXHIBIT- ASSIGNMENT OF INSURANCE BENEFITS

9/12/2018: EXHIBIT- ASSIGNMENT OF INSURANCE BENEFITS

EXHIBIT- CONTRACT

9/12/2018: EXHIBIT- CONTRACT

EXHIBIT- CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION & SATISFACTION

9/12/2018: EXHIBIT- CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION & SATISFACTION

NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES

9/12/2018: NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/12/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/12/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 09/12/2018

9/12/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 09/12/2018

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018092737

9/12/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018092737

COMPLAINT - AMENDED

9/17/2018: COMPLAINT - AMENDED

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

9/27/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME - RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/11/2018: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME - RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

3/18/2019: DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME - RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018092737

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 09/12/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION & SATISFACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- ASSIGNMENT OF INSURANCE BENEFITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WRIGHTWAY EMERGENCY WATER REMOVAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Peninsula Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEVEN I BATTISTI