This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 09/27/2021 at 21:00:44 (UTC).

THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY, WOOD, PEGGY P Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY, WOOD, PEGGY P was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Decedents

WOOD, PEGGY P

WOOD, PEGGY PILAS

Applicant

THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

WEISS, MIRANDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FEDERAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021175651)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketPETITION - NOTICE OF TRUST ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCODICIL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021165139)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketWILL ADMITTED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021165133)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - AND CODICIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketACTION: PROPOSED ORDER FORWARDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - EXHIBITS TO PETITION FOR ADMININSTRATION -RE: ILLINOIS STATUES REGARDING WILLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCODICIL ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK (NO RAISED SEAL - VERIFIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketWILL- ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK (NO RAISED SEAL - VERIFIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021071762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PRIVATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOATH - OF CORPORATE PERSON REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION FEDERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Northern Trust Company is a litigant