This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/06/2023 at 01:15:19 (UTC).

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY VS BARNETT, MASON

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARNETT, MASON. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BARNETT, MASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/1/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

2/1/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MASON BARNETT - ISSUED 2/2/2023

2/1/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MASON BARNETT - ISSUED 2/2/2023

NOTICE - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOLS FOR CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES

2/1/2023: NOTICE - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOLS FOR CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023010032

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023010032

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/8/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 06/05/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023010032

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOLS FOR CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MASON BARNETT - ISSUED 2/2/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less