Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 09:38:49 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR

Case Summary

On 01/27/2017 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

LANCELOTTI, PETER

IBERIABANK

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNORS CREDITORS AND TRUSTEES OF THE ESTATE OF RICHARD F LANCELOTTI AKA RICHARD LANCELLOTTI DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCNEIL, AMINA

GLADSTONE, ROGER

ALTERMAN, JEFFREY

Defendant Attorneys

BRKICH, MILAN

ENGVALSON, KINLEY

KENNELLY, SCOTT

KARYO, MAX

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019094398)

7/12/2019: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019094398)

PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2019066063

7/2/2019: PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2019066063

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

7/1/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

BID SHEET

7/1/2019: BID SHEET

ORDER - ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

6/28/2019: ORDER - ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019064323

6/27/2019: PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019064323

MOTION - EMERGENCY - TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

6/26/2019: MOTION - EMERGENCY - TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF COST INTEREST AND PAYMENTS

6/24/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF COST INTEREST AND PAYMENTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - LEAD COUNSEL - AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - ON BEHALF OF PETER LANCELLOTI

6/21/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - LEAD COUNSEL - AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - ON BEHALF OF PETER LANCELLOTI

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-IBERIA BANK FORMERLY KNOWN AS CENTURY BANK FSB - ISSUED 01/27/2017

1/27/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-IBERIA BANK FORMERLY KNOWN AS CENTURY BANK FSB - ISSUED 01/27/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN TENANT #1 - ISSUED 01/27/2017

1/27/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN TENANT #1 - ISSUED 01/27/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-PETER LANCELOTTI - ISSUED 01/27/2017

1/27/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-PETER LANCELOTTI - ISSUED 01/27/2017

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1/27/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

ADDRESS CHANGE

1/27/2017: ADDRESS CHANGE

NOTICE OF VALUE

1/27/2017: NOTICE OF VALUE

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017011163)

1/27/2017: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017011163)

COMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

1/27/2017: COMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/27/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019094398)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2019066063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019064323

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EMERGENCY - TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COST INTEREST AND PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - LEAD COUNSEL - AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - ON BEHALF OF PETER LANCELLOTI

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA - ISSUED 01/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-IBERIA BANK FORMERLY KNOWN AS CENTURY BANK FSB - ISSUED 01/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN TENANT #1 - ISSUED 01/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-PETER LANCELOTTI - ISSUED 01/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDRESS CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017011163)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where IBERIABANK is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALTERMAN, JEFFREY