This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/14/2020 at 15:25:11 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR FIRST HORIZON MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH TRUST 2007 2 VS ESSEX HOUSE ASSOCIATION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR FIRST HORIZON MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH TRUST 2007 2 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ESSEX HOUSE ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR FIRST HORIZON MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH TRUST 2007 2

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT A KIRSCHNER

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 N/K/A CARLOS FELIZ

KIRSCHNER, ROBERT A

ESSEX HOUSE ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 N/K/A WALLY KUULESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

FESNAK, HEATHER

EVANS, HALLIE SMITH

HUMMEL, BRIAN

SCHULTZ KIN, LESLIE

MORTON, MATTHEW

GOLDSMITH, STANLEY

O'MALLEY, DREW

Defendant Attorneys

ROWE, MICHELLE

GUARDADO, ASTRID

EDWARDS, KEVIN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/21/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM

2/16/2019: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - EMAIL DESIGNATION

12/20/2018: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE - SECOND INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

11/20/2018: NOTICE - SECOND INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

STATEMENT - CONDITIONS PRECEDENT

11/19/2018: STATEMENT - CONDITIONS PRECEDENT

NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

10/5/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ROBERT A JIRSCHNER

5/24/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ROBERT A JIRSCHNER

RESPONSE - PLAINTIFF

1/30/2018: RESPONSE - PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT - OF PLAINTIFF

11/29/2017: AFFIDAVIT - OF PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

12/11/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/21/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE - OF SERVING TRIAL ORDER

11/18/2019: NOTICE - OF SERVING TRIAL ORDER

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/12/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

BRIEF - PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

11/8/2019: BRIEF - PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

NOTICE OF FILING - ASSIGNMENT OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE

10/22/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - ASSIGNMENT OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE

LIST - DEFENDANT KIRSCHNER'S FINAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

10/1/2019: LIST - DEFENDANT KIRSCHNER'S FINAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

LIST - KIRSCHNER'S INITIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS

9/20/2019: LIST - KIRSCHNER'S INITIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/17/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

218 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED FOR 12/26/2019 PER SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - ROBERT A KIRSCHNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - ROBERT A. KIRSCHNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF CO-COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019120450

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:NON-JURY TRIAL - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALES SET FOR 12/26/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN ONLINE , JDG: JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
247 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 - ISSUED 03/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017027332)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less