This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/26/2022 at 18:33:46 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA VS THOMAS, CONNIE L

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 TD BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMAS, CONNIE L. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA

Defendant

THOMAS, CONNIE L

Venice, FL 34293-4222

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTERO, ANDRES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/2/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

12/2/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

12/2/2022: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/2/2022: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE - OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

12/2/2022: NOTICE - OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

12/2/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022106563

12/2/2022: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022106563

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - CONNIE L THOMAS

12/6/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - CONNIE L THOMAS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

12/21/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM F; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - CONNIE L THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 12/21/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN F , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500; Total Fee: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022106563

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONTERO , ANDRES