This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/06/2020 at 18:31:15 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N A VS HALEY, JOSHUA

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 TD BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HALEY, JOSHUA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N A

Defendant

HALEY, JOSHUA

Counter Defendant

TD BANK UA NA

Counter Plaintiff

HALEY, JOSHUA D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

MELENDEZ, BRIAN

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG, BRIAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

3/3/2020: NOTICE - AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

2/26/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/11/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

2/11/2020: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

MOTION - TO TRANSFER CAUSE FROM SMALL CLAIMS TO COURT OF COUNTY COURT

2/10/2020: MOTION - TO TRANSFER CAUSE FROM SMALL CLAIMS TO COURT OF COUNTY COURT

PAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2020014451

2/10/2020: PAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2020014451

COMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - AND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - JOSHUA D HALEY

2/10/2020: COMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - AND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - JOSHUA D HALEY

SUMMONS SERVED - JOSHUA HALEY

2/6/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - JOSHUA HALEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

2/4/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020003066

1/9/2020: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020003066

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- JOSHUA HALEY

1/9/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- JOSHUA HALEY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- JOSHUA D HALEY

1/9/2020: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- JOSHUA D HALEY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1/9/2020: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/9/2020: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/9/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

1/9/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$300.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO TRANSFER CAUSE FROM SMALL CLAIMS TO COURT OF COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2020014451

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - AND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - JOSHUA D HALEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JOSHUA HALEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020003066

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- JOSHUA HALEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 02/11/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- JOSHUA D HALEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less