This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/31/2023 at 17:46:35 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS SELLNER, PATRICK

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SELLNER, PATRICK. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

SELLNER, PATRICK

Venice, FL 34293-2931

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORNARO, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/13/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

1/13/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PATRICK SELLNER

1/17/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PATRICK SELLNER

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023004942

1/17/2023: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023004942

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM F; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500; Total Fee: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023004942

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PATRICK SELLNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 02/15/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN F , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less