This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/04/2023 at 18:37:17 (UTC).

SURGERY CONSULTANTS OF FL LLC VS INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 SURGERY CONSULTANTS OF FL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SURGERY CONSULTANTS OF FL LLC

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGELBRECHT, CHASE

Defendant Attorney

MOLLAGHAN, JOHN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

1/11/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

1/11/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1/11/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

REQUEST-ADMISSIONS

1/11/2023: REQUEST-ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/11/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT AND PIP ADDENDUM

1/11/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT AND PIP ADDENDUM

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023003720

1/12/2023: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023003720

SUMMONS SERVED - INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

1/23/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE - SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

1/30/2023: NOTICE - SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/30/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023003720

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT AND PIP ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST-ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less