This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/22/2022 at 18:44:47 (UTC).

SURGERY CONSULTANTS OF FL LLC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 SURGERY CONSULTANTS OF FL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SURGERY CONSULTANTS OF FL LLC

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGELBRECHT, CHASE

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

11/29/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

11/29/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/29/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/29/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/29/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT & PIP ADDENDUM

11/29/2022: NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT & PIP ADDENDUM

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022105114

11/29/2022: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022105114

SUMMONS SERVED - GECO INDEMNITY COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/13/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - GECO INDEMNITY COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADRESS

12/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADRESS

NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/14/2022: NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GECO INDEMNITY COMPANY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022105114

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT & PIP ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - ISSUED 12/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURGERY CONSULTANTS OF FL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant