This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 17:51:29 (UTC).

SUPREME ENERGY INC VS MJ RESTAURANT GROUP LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 SUPREME ENERGY INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MJ RESTAURANT GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUPREME ENERGY INC

Defendants

MOLLER, MOGENS

MJ RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

MOLLER, MOGEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPRECHMAN, STEVEN BRUCE

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

1/9/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018000321)

1/2/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018000321)

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM RYAN E SPRECHMAN

1/2/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM RYAN E SPRECHMAN

STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT

12/19/2017: STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

12/12/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

12/12/2017: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT

12/12/2017: STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT

SUMMONS SERVED - MJ RESTURANT GROUP LLC

12/8/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - MJ RESTURANT GROUP LLC

SUMMONS SERVED - MOGENS MOLLER AKA MOGEN MOLLER

12/5/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - MOGENS MOLLER AKA MOGEN MOLLER

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-MJ RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

11/14/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-MJ RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-MOGENS MOLLER AKA MOGEN MOLLER

11/14/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-MOGENS MOLLER AKA MOGEN MOLLER

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017106242

11/13/2017: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017106242

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - MOGENS MOLLER AKA MOGEN MOLLER

11/13/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - MOGENS MOLLER AKA MOGEN MOLLER

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - MJ RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

11/13/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - MJ RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

11/13/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/13/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018000321)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM RYAN E SPRECHMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 01/09/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN 5B , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MOGENS MOLLER AKA MOGEN MOLLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-MJ RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-MOGENS MOLLER AKA MOGEN MOLLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 12/12/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$195.00; Amount Paid:$195.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017106242

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - MOGENS MOLLER AKA MOGEN MOLLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - MJ RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less