This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 12:59:28 (UTC).

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION VS KOLOSKI, KEVIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KOLOSKI, KEVIN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

Defendants

KOLOSKI, KEVIN C

KOLOSKI, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUCH, JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/24/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY SERVICE

3/15/2019: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY SERVICE

RESPONSE - DEFENDANT

1/8/2019: RESPONSE - DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018081145

8/9/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018081145

ALIAS SUMMONS NON SERVED - KEVIN C KOLOSKI A/K/A KEVIN KOLOSKI

8/7/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS NON SERVED - KEVIN C KOLOSKI A/K/A KEVIN KOLOSKI

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017091236

9/27/2017: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017091236

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI - ISSUED 09/27/2017

9/27/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI - ISSUED 09/27/2017

COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

9/27/2017: COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/27/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

AFFIDAVIT - INTEREST AND COSTS

4/22/2019: AFFIDAVIT - INTEREST AND COSTS

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/22/2019: MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING

4/22/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI

3/15/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI

SUMMONS SERVED - KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI

1/14/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018109872

10/31/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018109872

SUMMONS ALIAS NON SERVED - KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI

7/13/2018: SUMMONS ALIAS NON SERVED - KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018002423

1/8/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018002423

SUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI-ISSUED 01/08/2018

1/8/2018: SUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI-ISSUED 01/08/2018

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019086525)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jun 17 2019 10:30AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - INTEREST AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - PLAN TO SELL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018002423

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI-ISSUED 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - OF SUMMONS (NOT ATTACHED) - NON-SERVED KEVIN KOLOSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$440.00; Amount Paid:$440.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017091236

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KEVIN C KOLOSKI AKA KEVIN KOLOSKI - ISSUED 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less