This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 18:20:01 (UTC).

STOPPIELLO, ELINOR PATRICIA VS STOPPIELLO, ANTHONY THOMAS

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 STOPPIELLO, ELINOR PATRICIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STOPPIELLO, ANTHONY THOMAS. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, DON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STOPPIELLO, ELINOR PATRICIA

Respondent

STOPPIELLO, ANTHONY THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • HearingTime:09:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:HEARING - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.50 RECEIPT #2017111267

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017146896)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: HEARING - CIVIL DATE: Nov 30 2017 9:15AM JUDGE: HALL, DON T LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketMOTION TO JUDGE TO EXPEDITE DOCKET DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE -LIMITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - PRO SE CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$411.50; Amount Paid:$411.50; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $401.00 RECEIPT #2017107736

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE -ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less