Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 05/01/2021 at 18:34:04 (UTC).

STONEYBROOK AT VENICE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC VS LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STONEYBROOK AT VENICE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STONEYBROOK AT VENICE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

VENEZIO, JOSEPH

LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC

TENANT 2 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

SMR FARMS LLC

TENANT 1 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

VENEZIO, JUNE A

LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROWE, MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT - JOSEPH VENEZIO

4/21/2021: DEFAULT - JOSEPH VENEZIO

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOSEPH VENEZIO

4/20/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOSEPH VENEZIO

DEFAULT - JUNE A VENEZIO

4/16/2021: DEFAULT - JUNE A VENEZIO

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JUNE A VENEZIO

4/15/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JUNE A VENEZIO

DEFAULT - LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC - SMR FARMS LLC

4/1/2021: DEFAULT - LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC - SMR FARMS LLC

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC AND SMR FARMS LLC

3/31/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC AND SMR FARMS LLC

SUMMONS SERVED - JOSEPH VENEZIO

3/31/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - JOSEPH VENEZIO

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021057091)

3/31/2021: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021057091)

SUMMONS NON SERVED - TENANT #2 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

3/25/2021: SUMMONS NON SERVED - TENANT #2 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

3/2/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TENANT 1 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION - ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/2/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TENANT 1 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION - ISSUED 03/02/2021

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE - ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/2/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE - ISSUED 03/02/2021

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SMR FARMS LLC - ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/2/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SMR FARMS LLC - ISSUED 03/02/2021

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/2/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC ISSUED 03/02/2021

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JUNE A VENEZIO - ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/2/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JUNE A VENEZIO - ISSUED 03/02/2021

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOSEPH VENEZIO - ISSUED 03/02/2021

3/2/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOSEPH VENEZIO - ISSUED 03/02/2021

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021035675)

3/2/2021: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021035675)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/2/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - JOSEPH VENEZIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOSEPH VENEZIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - JUNE A VENEZIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JUNE A VENEZIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC - SMR FARMS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC AND SMR FARMS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JOSEPH VENEZIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021057091)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - TENANT #2 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - TENANT #1 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TENANT 2 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSESSION - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TENANT 1 AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SMR FARMS LLC - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LENNAR MORTGAGE LLC FKA EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JUNE A VENEZIO - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOSEPH VENEZIO - ISSUED 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021035675)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMR FARMS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STONEYBROOK AT VENICE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROWE, MICHELLE