This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/13/2021 at 06:12:36 (UTC).

STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC VS DOMINGUEZ, HUBER A

Case Summary

On 12/06/2017 STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ, HUBER A. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC

Defendant

DOMINGUEZ, HUBER A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEB, DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

PLAYER, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/6/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/6/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/6/2017: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-HUBER A DOMINGUEZ- ISSUED 12/6/2017

12/6/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-HUBER A DOMINGUEZ- ISSUED 12/6/2017

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017113592

12/6/2017: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017113592

SUMMONS SERVED - HUBER A DOMINGUEZ

12/20/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - HUBER A DOMINGUEZ

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

1/2/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER, AFFIRMATION DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIN, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/2/2018: ANSWER, AFFIRMATION DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIN, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

1/3/2018: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

PAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2018001002

1/4/2018: PAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2018001002

ANSWER - TO COUNTERCLAIM

1/18/2018: ANSWER - TO COUNTERCLAIM

MOTION - STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1/19/2018: MOTION - STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - COUNT I

4/3/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - COUNT I

NOTICE OF HEARING - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

4/3/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

7/7/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019098445)

7/19/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019098445)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/19/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019098445)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: LACK OF PROSECUTION DATE: Jul 19 2019 9:00AM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - COUNT I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - TO COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2018001002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATION DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HUBER A DOMINGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$805.00; Amount Paid:$805.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017113592

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-HUBER A DOMINGUEZ- ISSUED 12/6/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP is a litigant