This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 07:16:39 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS BRYANT, HORACE W

Case Summary

On 10/08/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against BRYANT, HORACE W. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BRYANT, HORACE W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NODARSE-BUSCEMI, ODALYS

Defendant Attorneys

BARI, GENELLE

CASH, CARY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

8/26/2019: NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFIED COPY OF INSURANCE POLICY AND DECLARATION OF COVERAGE

3/27/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFIED COPY OF INSURANCE POLICY AND DECLARATION OF COVERAGE

SUBPOENA RETURNED - NONSERVED - CYNTHIA DODD

3/27/2019: SUBPOENA RETURNED - NONSERVED - CYNTHIA DODD

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/28/2019: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/22/2019: NOTICE - DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/20/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - SERVICE OF PROPERTY DAMAGE INTERROGATORIES

12/20/2018: NOTICE - SERVICE OF PROPERTY DAMAGE INTERROGATORIES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018101722

10/8/2018: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018101722

COMPLAINT

10/5/2018: COMPLAINT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

1/7/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING - TELEPHONIC

12/16/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING - TELEPHONIC

NOTICE - OF MEDIATION

12/3/2019: NOTICE - OF MEDIATION

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - CYNTHIA DODD

8/29/2019: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - CYNTHIA DODD

SUBPOENA SERVED - HORACE W. BRYANT

7/26/2019: SUBPOENA SERVED - HORACE W. BRYANT

MOTION - MEDIATION

2/22/2019: MOTION - MEDIATION

NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

2/22/2019: NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS SERVED - HORACE W BRYANT

12/17/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - HORACE W BRYANT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/5/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingTime:02:45 PM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 7 2020 2:45PM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ON MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - TELEPHONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 7 2020 2:45PM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF PROPERTY DAMAGE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - HORACE W BRYANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HORACE W BRYANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018101722

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HORACE W BRYANT - ISSUED 10/08//18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less