This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/17/2023 at 12:12:26 (UTC).

STAR2STAR COMMUNICATIONS LLC VS GENERATIONS VISA SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 STAR2STAR COMMUNICATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GENERATIONS VISA SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAR2STAR COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Defendant

GENERATIONS VISA SERVICE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUARNIERI, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/28/2022: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

2/28/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GENERATIONS VISA SERVICE INC

2/28/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GENERATIONS VISA SERVICE INC

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022018153

2/28/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022018153

SUMMONS SERVED - GENERATIONS VISA SERVICE INC

3/18/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - GENERATIONS VISA SERVICE INC

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

5/13/2022: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GENERATIONS VISA SERVICE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - CTY >$15,000<=$30,000; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022018153

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GENERATIONS VISA SERVICE INC- ISSUED 03/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less