This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/23/2023 at 01:03:11 (UTC).

STAR2STAR COMMUNICATIONS LLC VS DANIEL, DANNY K Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 STAR2STAR COMMUNICATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANIEL, DANNY K. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAR2STAR COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Defendants

JAKE MARSHALL SERVICE INC

DANIEL, DANNY K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUARNIERI, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - DANNY K DANIEL

10/20/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - DANNY K DANIEL

MOTION - DISMISS - IN ALTERNATIVE TO STAY PROCEEDING PENDING ARBITRATION

10/18/2022: MOTION - DISMISS - IN ALTERNATIVE TO STAY PROCEEDING PENDING ARBITRATION

SUMMONS SERVED - JAKE MARSHAL SERVICE INC BY SERVING DANNY DANIEL AS REGISTERED AGENT

10/3/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - JAKE MARSHAL SERVICE INC BY SERVING DANNY DANIEL AS REGISTERED AGENT

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022083969

9/15/2022: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022083969

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JAKE MARSHALL SERVICE INC

9/14/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JAKE MARSHALL SERVICE INC

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DANNY K DANIEL

9/14/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DANNY K DANIEL

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

9/8/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022077743

8/29/2022: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022077743

COMPLAINT

8/26/2022: COMPLAINT

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

2/22/2023: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

ORDER SETTING TRIAL

2/22/2023: ORDER SETTING TRIAL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/21/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

REPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/20/2023: REPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/6/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - TO DIVISION C

12/28/2022: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - TO DIVISION C

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - MORGAN R BENTLEY

11/16/2022: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - MORGAN R BENTLEY

ORDER - GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

11/16/2022: ORDER - GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

AFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION

11/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CNCL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 02/21/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CNCL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - TO DIVISION C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DANNY K DANIEL - ISSUED 9/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 01/23/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $420.00; Amount Paid: $420.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022077743

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less