This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/24/2023 at 18:45:36 (UTC).

STAR2STAR COMMUNICATIONS LLC VS ACHIEVEMENTS LEARNING CENTER Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 STAR2STAR COMMUNICATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ACHIEVEMENTS LEARNING CENTER. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAR2STAR COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Defendants

ACHIEVEMENTS LEARNING CENTER

THE ACHIEVEMENTS GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUARNIERI, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/7/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

10/7/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -THE ACHIEVEMENTS GROUP INC DBA ACHIEVEMENTS LEARNING CENTER- ISSUED 10/07/2022

10/7/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -THE ACHIEVEMENTS GROUP INC DBA ACHIEVEMENTS LEARNING CENTER- ISSUED 10/07/2022

NOTICE -STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

10/7/2022: NOTICE -STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022090035

10/7/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022090035

SUMMONS SERVED - THE ACHIEVEMENTS GROUP INC D/B/A ACHIEVEMENTS LEARNING CENTER

11/2/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - THE ACHIEVEMENTS GROUP INC D/B/A ACHIEVEMENTS LEARNING CENTER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - THE ACHIEVEMENTS GROUP INC D/B/A ACHIEVEMENTS LEARNING CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - CTY >$15,000<=$30,000; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022090035

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE -STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -THE ACHIEVEMENTS GROUP INC DBA ACHIEVEMENTS LEARNING CENTER- ISSUED 10/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less