This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/14/2020 at 22:57:55 (UTC).

SPETRINO, ARTHUR Et Al VS HARVEY, LORRAINE S

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 SPETRINO, ARTHUR filed an Other lawsuit against HARVEY, LORRAINE S. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPETRINO, ARTHUR

SPETRINO, JOHANNA

Defendant

HARVEY, LORRAINE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WHITTEMORE, KENT

WHITTEMORE, KENT G

Defendant Attorney

SALTARELLI, DOUGLAS CEDIO

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018014657)

2/2/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018014657)

STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

1/18/2018: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, JOANNA SPETRINO

12/11/2017: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, JOANNA SPETRINO

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, ARTHUR SPETRINO

12/11/2017: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, ARTHUR SPETRINO

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION DEPOSITION

12/11/2017: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION DEPOSITION

NOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

11/28/2017: NOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

11/28/2017: NOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

11/15/2017: NOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

11/15/2017: NOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

7/20/2017: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - FOR LORRAINE S HARVEY

7/20/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - FOR LORRAINE S HARVEY

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017050248

5/23/2017: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017050248

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LORRAINE S HARVEY - ISSUED 05/23/2017

5/22/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LORRAINE S HARVEY - ISSUED 05/23/2017

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

5/22/2017: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

5/22/2017: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

5/22/2017: COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/22/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018014657)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, JOANNA SPETRINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, ARTHUR SPETRINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF-JOHANNA SPETRINO

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - FOR LORRAINE S HARVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017050248

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LORRAINE S HARVEY - ISSUED 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less