This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:32:12 (UTC).

SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC VS GINSBERG-KLEMMT, ACHIM Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against GINSBERG-KLEMMT, ACHIM. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

GINSBERG-KLEMMT, ERIKA

GINSBERG-KLEMMT, ACHIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ULRICH, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

10/15/2020: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

MOTION - LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

10/14/2020: MOTION - LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

MOTION - DISMISS

10/12/2020: MOTION - DISMISS

SUMMONS SERVED - ERIKA GINSBERG-KLEMMT

10/6/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - ERIKA GINSBERG-KLEMMT

SUMMONS SERVED - ACHIM GINSBERG-KLEMMT

10/6/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - ACHIM GINSBERG-KLEMMT

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020075762

9/25/2020: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020075762

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE: ACHIM GINSBERG KLEMMT -ISSUED ON 09-25-2020

9/25/2020: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE: ACHIM GINSBERG KLEMMT -ISSUED ON 09-25-2020

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE: ERIKA GINSBERG KLEMMT -ISSUED 09-25-2020

9/25/2020: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE: ERIKA GINSBERG KLEMMT -ISSUED 09-25-2020

COMPLAINT

9/25/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ERIKA GINSBERG-KLEMMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ACHIM GINSBERG-KLEMMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020075762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE: ACHIM GINSBERG KLEMMT -ISSUED ON 09-25-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE: ERIKA GINSBERG KLEMMT -ISSUED 09-25-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less