This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/21/2023 at 00:29:57 (UTC).

SOLBERG, GARETT Et Al VS WHITAKER JV LLC

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 SOLBERG, GARETT filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against WHITAKER JV LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOLBERG, GARETT

SOLBERG, MICHELLE

Defendant

WHITAKER JV LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICALE, KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

GUARNIERI, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

11/30/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

11/7/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

SUBPOENA RETURNED - ANGELA D UNZICKER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

11/2/2022: SUBPOENA RETURNED - ANGELA D UNZICKER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON-PARTY

10/21/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/21/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

10/4/2022: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

ANSWER - WHITAKER JV LLC

9/19/2022: ANSWER - WHITAKER JV LLC

ORDER - ON STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/12/2022: ORDER - ON STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

STIPULATION - TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/9/2022: STIPULATION - TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: NON-JURY TRIAL - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • HearingTime: 08:45 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - ANGELA D UNZICKER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - WHITAKER JV LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 12/02/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 6C , JDG: MCHUGH, ANDREA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022056703

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WHITAKER JV LLC - ISSUED 6/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022107117)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less