Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 04/25/2021 at 18:06:29 (UTC).

SMITH JR, RICHARD N VS BLACKMAN, BRITTANY R

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 SMITH JR, RICHARD N filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BLACKMAN, BRITTANY R. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUHL, MARIA and BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUHL, MARIA

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH JR, RICHARD N

Respondent

BLACKMAN, BRITTANY R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WALLACE, JAIME LYNN

Respondent Attorney

KING, AMANDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketORDER - DISQUALIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION - TO DISQUALIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketANSWER - TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RICHARD N SMITH JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketORDER - OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED FROM 2021 DR 000880 NC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketANSWER - TO PETITION - BRITTANY R BLACKMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $407.50 RECEIPT #2021015906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - RICHARD N SMITH JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FAMILY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BRITTANY R BLACKMAN - ISSUED 02/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, AMANDA