This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/20/2022 at 18:07:28 (UTC).

SIMIL, JENNIFER GOMES VS PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 SIMIL, JENNIFER GOMES filed an Other lawsuit against PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUNING, KEVIN R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRUNING, KEVIN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEADLE, JOSHUA

JOSHUA BEADLE ON BEHALF OF ALL THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendant

PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMIL, JENNIFER

Defendant Attorney

BROTMAN, STEVEN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/21/2022: COMPLAINT

NOTICE - OF SERVING DISCOVERY REQUESTS

10/21/2022: NOTICE - OF SERVING DISCOVERY REQUESTS

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER ASSISTANCE AGENCY PARENTS ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED DBA PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY

10/21/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER ASSISTANCE AGENCY PARENTS ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED DBA PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022095818

10/26/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022095818

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

10/31/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

11/21/2022: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVL ACTION

11/30/2022: NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVL ACTION

NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION

12/5/2022: NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

12/6/2022: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CANC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVL ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 02/21/2023 AT 2:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: BRUNING, KEVIN R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022095818

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER ASSISTANCE AGENCY PARENTS ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED DBA PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY - ISSUED 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER SIMIL