This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 06/16/2021 at 21:03:45 (UTC).

SICARD, ALICE BARBARA, SICARD, RICHARD LOUIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 SICARD, ALICE BARBARA, SICARD, RICHARD LOUIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Decedent

SICARD, ALICE BARBARA

Applicant

SICARD, RICHARD LOUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

HINES, ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021103896)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION - NOTICE OF TRUST ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketWILL ADMITTED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021094557)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketACTION: PROPOSED ORDER FORWARDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketWILL- ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021041486

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED (INCORRECT DATE OF WILL S/B 08/26/2005)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PRIVATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FLORIDA TAX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT HINES