This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/05/2023 at 18:36:25 (UTC).

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER LLC VS JEFFERSON DAVIS, QUAI DAQUAN CHANGA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 SFR OWNER ML BORROWER LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JEFFERSON DAVIS, QUAI DAQUAN CHANGA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR OWNER ML BORROWER LLC

Defendant

JEFFERSON DAVIS, QUAI DAQUAN CHANGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/13/2023: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - QUAI DAQUAN CHANGA JEFFERSON DAVIS - ISSUED 1/23/2022

1/13/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - QUAI DAQUAN CHANGA JEFFERSON DAVIS - ISSUED 1/23/2022

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2023004247

1/13/2023: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2023004247

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

1/27/2023: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $195.00; Amount Paid: $195.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2023004247

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - QUAI DAQUAN CHANGA JEFFERSON DAVIS - ISSUED 1/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less