This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/05/2023 at 18:09:46 (UTC).

SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1, LLC VS AKINDOJU, KRISTIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 SFR INVESTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BORROWER 1, LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1, LLC

Defendants

AKINDOJU, KRISTIN

LOGGINS, NICKOLAS

BATES, ADAYLA

MILLER, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUIKSHANK, ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/6/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

11/6/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -KRISTIN AKINDOJU - ISSUED 11/7/2022

11/6/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -KRISTIN AKINDOJU - ISSUED 11/7/2022

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -NICKOLAS LOGGINS - ISSUED 11/7/2022

11/6/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -NICKOLAS LOGGINS - ISSUED 11/7/2022

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -ADAYLA BATES - ISSUED 11/7/2022

11/6/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -ADAYLA BATES - ISSUED 11/7/2022

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -MARIA MILLER - ISSUED 11/7/2022

11/6/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -MARIA MILLER - ISSUED 11/7/2022

PAYMENT $225.00 RECEIPT #2022099137

11/7/2022: PAYMENT $225.00 RECEIPT #2022099137

SUMMONS SERVED - KRISTEN AKINDOJU - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

11/17/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - KRISTEN AKINDOJU - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

SUMMONS SERVED - NICKOLAS LOGGINS

11/17/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - NICKOLAS LOGGINS

SUMMONS SERVED - ADAYLA BATES - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

11/17/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - ADAYLA BATES - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

SUMMONS SERVED - MARIA MILLER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

11/17/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - MARIA MILLER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

REQUEST - TRIAL/HEARING - OBJECTION TO EVICTION BASED ON DISABILITY - KRISTIN AKINDOJU

11/28/2022: REQUEST - TRIAL/HEARING - OBJECTION TO EVICTION BASED ON DISABILITY - KRISTIN AKINDOJU

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - KRISTIN AKINDOJU, NICKOLAS LOGGINS, ADAYLA BATES AND MARIA MILLER

11/30/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - KRISTIN AKINDOJU, NICKOLAS LOGGINS, ADAYLA BATES AND MARIA MILLER

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

12/15/2022: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - KRISTIN AKINDOJU, NICKOLAS LOGGINS, ADAYLA BATES AND MARIA MILLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketACTION: EMAILED REQUEST - TRIAL/HEARING - OBJECTION TO EVICTION BASED ON DISABILITY - KRISTIN AKINDOJU TO JUDGE GALEN'S JUDICIAL ASSISTANT FOR REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - TRIAL/HEARING - OBJECTION TO EVICTION BASED ON DISABILITY - KRISTIN AKINDOJU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MARIA MILLER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ADAYLA BATES - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - NICKOLAS LOGGINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - KRISTEN AKINDOJU - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $225.00; Amount Paid: $225.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $225.00 RECEIPT #2022099137

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -MARIA MILLER - ISSUED 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -ADAYLA BATES - ISSUED 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -NICKOLAS LOGGINS - ISSUED 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -KRISTIN AKINDOJU - ISSUED 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK