This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 06/02/2022 at 18:54:53 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC VS ENGLISH, DYLAN

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 SECOND ROUND SUB LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ENGLISH, DYLAN. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC

Defendant

ENGLISH, DYLAN

North Port, FL 34286

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELANSON, KYLE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/9/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

5/9/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

5/9/2022: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

5/9/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DYLAN ENGLISH

5/9/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DYLAN ENGLISH

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022041705

5/9/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022041705

SUMMONS NON SERVED - DYLAN ENGLISH

5/20/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - DYLAN ENGLISH

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/25/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - DYLAN ENGLISH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022041705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DYLAN ENGLISH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/25/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELANSON , KYLE