This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/18/2023 at 18:03:03 (UTC).

SECOND AVENUE SFR HOLDINGS III LLC VS DIAZ, EDWARD Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 SECOND AVENUE SFR HOLDINGS III LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DIAZ, EDWARD. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND AVENUE SFR HOLDINGS III LLC

Defendants

DIAZ, EDWARD

DIAZ, HEATHER ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVIS, MICHAEL

SIEGEL, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/16/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/16/2023: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - EDWARD DIAZ - ISSUED 1/23/2022

1/16/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - EDWARD DIAZ - ISSUED 1/23/2022

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HEATHER ANN DIAZ - ISSUED 1/23/2022

1/16/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HEATHER ANN DIAZ - ISSUED 1/23/2022

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2023004882

1/17/2023: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2023004882

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

1/26/2023: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $205.00; Amount Paid: $205.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2023004882

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HEATHER ANN DIAZ - ISSUED 1/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - EDWARD DIAZ - ISSUED 1/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less