This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/14/2023 at 11:24:18 (UTC).

SEASONS SERVICE SELECT LLC Et Al VS BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 SEASONS SERVICE SELECT LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SSS DOWN TO EARTH OPCO LLC

SEASONS SERVICE SELECT LLC

Defendants

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

WELLS, COREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEAT, NATHAN

Defendant Attorney

RANIS, PAUL BERNARD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/24/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/24/2022: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022095405

10/25/2022: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022095405

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES SERVICES INC - ISSUED 10/27/2022

10/27/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES SERVICES INC - ISSUED 10/27/2022

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - UNABLE TO ISSUE - DEFENDANT'S NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT - COREY WELLS

10/27/2022: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - UNABLE TO ISSUE - DEFENDANT'S NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT - COREY WELLS

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022096168

10/27/2022: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022096168

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

11/2/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

CERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE

11/8/2022: CERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE

ANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC AND COREY WELLS

12/6/2022: ANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC AND COREY WELLS

MOTION - TO DISMISS COUNTS I, V, VI & VII OF COMPLAINT

12/6/2022: MOTION - TO DISMISS COUNTS I, V, VI & VII OF COMPLAINT

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

12/9/2022: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

12/9/2022: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/9/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/9/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO DISMISS COUNTS I, V, VI & VII OF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC AND COREY WELLS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 02/21/2023 AT 2:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: BRUNING, KEVIN R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022096168

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- COREY WELLS- ISSUED 10/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES SERVICES INC - ISSUED 10/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $420.00; Amount Paid: $420.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022095405

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less