This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/24/2021 at 16:08:54 (UTC).

SCHWANS, ROXANNE MARIE VS ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 SCHWANS, ROXANNE MARIE filed an Other lawsuit against ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, STEPHEN and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, STEPHEN

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHWANS, ROXANNE MARIE

Defendants

ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

STEPHENS, ANDREA JEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEBAALY, BRIAN

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS, BENJAMIN

OWENS, JOHN

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/19/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CROSS VIA ZOOM

8/18/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CROSS VIA ZOOM

NOTICE- MEDIATION

7/30/2020: NOTICE- MEDIATION

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- VOLUNTARY WITH PREJUDICE

7/28/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- VOLUNTARY WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/11/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE - SERVICE ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

6/9/2020: NOTICE - SERVICE ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE - SERVICE ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

6/9/2020: NOTICE - SERVICE ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

6/8/2020: NOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

RESPONSE - TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

6/4/2020: RESPONSE - TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/20/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/20/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

12/20/2019: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/20/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLERK NOT ABLE TO ISSUE DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE

12/20/2019: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLERK NOT ABLE TO ISSUE DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ANDREA JEAN STEPHENS- ISSUED 12/20/2019

12/20/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ANDREA JEAN STEPHENS- ISSUED 12/20/2019

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

12/20/2019: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)- AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/20/2019: COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)- AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/20/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CROSS VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL- VOLUNTARY WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLERK NOT ABLE TO ISSUE DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ANDREA JEAN STEPHENS- ISSUED 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)- AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEBAALY, BRIAN