This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/21/2022 at 07:59:23 (UTC).

SCHNEIDER, BRYAN R VS AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 SCHNEIDER, BRYAN R filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHNEIDER, BRYAN R

Defendants

TICHY, JOANNE R

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAIR, MOLLIE

HERNANDEZ, DENNIS

Defendant Attorney

IACONO, VINCENT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST - SECOND FOR SUBMISSION TO NEUROPSYCHOLGICAL EVALUATION

1/20/2022: REQUEST - SECOND FOR SUBMISSION TO NEUROPSYCHOLGICAL EVALUATION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/20/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/20/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST - COPIES

1/18/2022: REQUEST - COPIES

MOTION - COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF

1/14/2022: MOTION - COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

1/13/2022: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

1/13/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/13/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/13/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7A; Description:JURY TRIAL - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingTime:08:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7A; Description:MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingTime:09:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7A; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - CIRCUIT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - SECOND FOR SUBMISSION TO NEUROPSYCHOLGICAL EVALUATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (TRANSFERRED FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (TRANSFERRED FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (TRANSFERRED FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - JOANNE R TICHY (TRANSFERRED FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (TRANSFERRED FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (TRANSFERRED FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET (TRANSFERRED FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021023651

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IACONO , VINCENT FRANK