This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/09/2020 at 21:02:37 (UTC).

SAVINO, ANTHONY, SAVINO, DOMINICK Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 SAVINO, ANTHONY, SAVINO, DOMINICK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Applicant

SAVINO, DOMINICK

Decedent

SAVINO, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

EDWARDS, SHERYL ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketWILL- EXEMPLIFIED COPIES FROM OTHER STATE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020139852)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (BOND REQUIRED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketACTION: PROPOSED ORDER FORWARDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketWILL- EXEMPLIFIED COPIES ORIGINAL PAPER FILED-SCANNED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020075793

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PRIVATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - NONRESIDENT

    Read MoreRead Less