This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/27/2022 at 12:41:54 (UTC).

SARASOTA ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES LLC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 SARASOTA ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARASOTA ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDBERG, CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018059158

6/7/2018: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018059158

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/24/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - CHRISTINA A GOLDBERG ESQ

5/3/2019: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - CHRISTINA A GOLDBERG ESQ

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

9/13/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE - NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

5/3/2019: RESPONSE - NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

MOTION - ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND

7/23/2018: MOTION - ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

12/23/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

6/13/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

4/17/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM CHRISTINA A GOLDBERG, ESQUIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • HearingTime: 11:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 5C; Description: LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • HearingTime: 09:15 AM; Location: COURTROOM 5C; Description: MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: JUN 3 2019 9:15AM JUDGE: DENKIN, DAVID LEE LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018059158

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 07/03/2018 AT 10:30 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SARASOTA ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hoffman, Stephanie Spaulding