Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 03/26/2021 at 18:03:42 (UTC).

SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA VS MILLER, MICHAEL L

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MILLER, MICHAEL L. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA

Defendants

MILLER, MICHAEL L

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MICHAEL L MILLER DECEASED

THERESA MILLER AS SURVIVING SPOUSE OF MICHAEL L MILLER DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOSSARD, SCOTT THOMAS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MICHAEL L. MILLER

3/12/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MICHAEL L. MILLER

SUMMONS SERVED - THERESA MILLER

3/12/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - THERESA MILLER

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2021010945

2/8/2021: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2021010945

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MICHAEL L MILLER DECEASED - ISSUED 2/09/21

2/8/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MICHAEL L MILLER DECEASED - ISSUED 2/09/21

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - THERESA MILLER AS SURVIVING SPOUSE OF MICHAEL L MILLER DECEASED - ISSUED 2/09/21

2/8/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - THERESA MILLER AS SURVIVING SPOUSE OF MICHAEL L MILLER DECEASED - ISSUED 2/09/21

ORDER - GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND AMEND CASE STYLE TO NAME PROPER DEFENDANTS

2/5/2021: ORDER - GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND AMEND CASE STYLE TO NAME PROPER DEFENDANTS

MOTION - FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND AMEND CASE STYLE TO NAME OF DEFENDANTS

2/4/2021: MOTION - FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND AMEND CASE STYLE TO NAME OF DEFENDANTS

SUMMONS NON SERVED - MICHAEL L MILLER

1/28/2021: SUMMONS NON SERVED - MICHAEL L MILLER

PAYMENT $915.00 RECEIPT #2021006796

1/25/2021: PAYMENT $915.00 RECEIPT #2021006796

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL L MILLER - ISSUED 01/26/2021

1/25/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL L MILLER - ISSUED 01/26/2021

COMPLAINT

1/25/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MICHAEL L. MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - THERESA MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2021010945

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MICHAEL L MILLER DECEASED - ISSUED 2/09/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - THERESA MILLER AS SURVIVING SPOUSE OF MICHAEL L MILLER DECEASED - ISSUED 2/09/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND AMEND CASE STYLE TO NAME PROPER DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND AMEND CASE STYLE TO NAME OF DEFENDANTS -- WITH AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - MICHAEL L MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$935.00; Amount Paid:$935.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $915.00 RECEIPT #2021006796

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL L MILLER - ISSUED 01/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSSARD, SCOTT THOMAS