Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 05/03/2021 at 18:02:44 (UTC).

SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA VS LAPOINTE, WILLIAM JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAPOINTE, WILLIAM JOSEPH. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA

Defendant

LAPOINTE, WILLIAM JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPAGNA, CAMILE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

4/15/2021: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

4/7/2021: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

4/6/2021: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS SERVED - WILLIAM JOSEPH LAPOINTE

3/12/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - WILLIAM JOSEPH LAPOINTE

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM JOSEPH LAPOINTE

3/5/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM JOSEPH LAPOINTE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021018789

3/4/2021: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021018789

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

3/4/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

3/4/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/4/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/04/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN ZOOM , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - WILLIAM JOSEPH LAPOINTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM JOSEPH LAPOINTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 04/06/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021018789

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SARASOTA COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant