This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:32:19 (UTC).

SANCHEZ UGANDO, ABRAHAM VS GARCIA RUIZ, KARLA ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 SANCHEZ UGANDO, ABRAHAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARCIA RUIZ, KARLA ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANCHEZ UGANDO, ABRAHAM

Respondent

GARCIA RUIZ, KARLA ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RIZA, GABRIELA

Respondent Attorney

VILLAVERDE, MONICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketOPPOSITION - MOTION TO CHANGE OR TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMOTION - TO CHANGE OR TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED- KARLA ELIZABETH GARCIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$407.50; Amount Paid:$407.50; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $407.50 RECEIPT #2020075857

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS FAMILY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KARLA ELIZABETH GARCIA RUIZ - ISSUED 9/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE- STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING- CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT- UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - FINANCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less