This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/11/2021 at 21:31:09 (UTC).

SALTER, TERESA R

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 SALTER, TERESA R was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

SALTER, TERESA R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketORDER- APPOINT MONITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • HearingTime:10:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM 8B; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketORDER WAIVING INITIAL FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021175256)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF EMERGENCY GUARDIANSHIP FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021175285)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOATH - OF CORPORATE GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Sep 23 2021 10:15AM JUDGE: WILLIAMS, CHARLES E LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Sep 23 2021 10:15AM JUDGE: WILLIAMS, CHARLES E LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketACTION: ATTORNEY DAVID BOUZIANE ASSIGNED FROM ROTATION LIST FOR AIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION - FOR ORDER WAIVING INITIAL FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR EMERGENCY GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR GUARDIAN - PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less