This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 04:35:54 (UTC).

RU AN INSURED INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS/HER ASSIGNEE VALRICO SPINE & REHAB CENTER LLC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 RU AN INSURED INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS/HER ASSIGNEE VALRICO SPINE REHAB CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RU AN INSURED INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS/HER ASSIGNEE VALRICO SPINE & REHAB CENTER LLC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN, PHILIP

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

8/25/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

8/24/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

8/24/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

8/24/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/23/2017: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/8/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/8/2017: PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

7/27/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

7/27/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017066037

7/10/2017: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017066037

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

7/10/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

7/10/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

7/10/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017066037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/08/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less