This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 17:29:42 (UTC).

REVIVE MEDICAL SPA LLC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 REVIVE MEDICAL SPA LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVIVE MEDICAL SPA LLC

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, H

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - SERVICE - INTERROGATORIES

3/11/2019: NOTICE - SERVICE - INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE - DEFENDANTS - TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

8/21/2018: RESPONSE - DEFENDANTS - TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER RATIFYING JOINT STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

8/17/2018: ORDER RATIFYING JOINT STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

8/14/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE - SERVING REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY DEMANDS

3/15/2018: NOTICE - SERVING REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY DEMANDS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1/11/2018: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY- ISSUED 11/27/2017

11/27/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY- ISSUED 11/27/2017

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017105052

11/8/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017105052

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

11/8/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANTS

8/21/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANTS

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ROSENBERG LAW PA

8/17/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ROSENBERG LAW PA

STIPULATION - JOINT - FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

8/14/2018: STIPULATION - JOINT - FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

MOTION TO COMPEL

4/23/2018: MOTION TO COMPEL

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE

3/15/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

1/11/2018: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

1/3/2018: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY 3-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

12/5/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY 3-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017110273

11/27/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017110273

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 29 2020 1:30PM JUDGE: BOEHM, MARYANN LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO COMPEL DEPOSITION LITIGATION REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE - INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - DEFENDANTS - TO FIRST REQUEAT TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - DEFENDANTS - TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY 3-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017110273

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY- ISSUED 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$320.00; Amount Paid:$320.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017105052

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED-GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY-20 DAY SUMMONS NOT PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less