Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/12/2021 at 16:14:41 (UTC).

REKRET, ANDREW, REKRET, ANDRZEJ Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 REKRET, ANDREW, REKRET, ANDRZEJ was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Decedents

REKRET, ANDRZEJ

REKRET, ANDREW

Applicant

REKRET, TADEUSZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

RIDDELL, CYNTHIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - 12/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketBOND - APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FEDERAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020160574)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketWILL ADMITTED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020152537)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (BOND REQUIRED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketACTION: PROPOSED ORDER FORWARDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketWILL- ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK (AFFIDAVIT ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketWILL- ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK (AFFIDAVIT ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020083419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PRIVATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION FEDERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIDDELL, CYNTHIA