This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 21:58:56 (UTC).

REAL SUB LLC VS SUBWAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 REAL SUB LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SUBWAY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REAL SUB LLC

Defendant

SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC D/B/A SUBWAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PICCOLO, DAVID MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

AYERS, W

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

12/12/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC DBA SUBWAY- ISSUED 12/13/2022

12/12/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC DBA SUBWAY- ISSUED 12/13/2022

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022109650

12/13/2022: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022109650

NOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE - ASHLEY AINSLEY

12/22/2022: NOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE - ASHLEY AINSLEY

SUMMONS SERVED - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC - MANAGER

12/22/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC - MANAGER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC DBA SUBWAY

12/27/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC DBA SUBWAY

DEFAULT - PROPOSED

12/27/2022: DEFAULT - PROPOSED

DEFAULT - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC D/B/A SUBWAY

12/28/2022: DEFAULT - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC D/B/A SUBWAY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC D/B/A SUBWAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC DBA SUBWAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC DBA SUBWAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE - ASHLEY AINSLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $195.00; Amount Paid: $195.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022109650

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SUBWAY REAL ESTATE LLC DBA SUBWAY- ISSUED 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less