This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/10/2021 at 11:21:37 (UTC).

RAYMOND BUILDING SUPPLY, LLC VS AFFINITY CUSTOM HOMES NKA AFFINITY BUILDING GROUP Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 RAYMOND BUILDING SUPPLY, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AFFINITY CUSTOM HOMES NKA AFFINITY BUILDING GROUP. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYMOND BUILDING SUPPLY, LLC

Defendants

TENANTS/OCCUPANTS, UNKNOWN

MJ ENTERPRISES OF FLORIDA LLC

PATEL, MAHESHKUMAR

SCHOOF, LARRY

AMERIGAS PROPANE

ST. GERMAIN, MICHAEL

GROWING GREEN LANDSCAPING SERVICES, INC.

AFFINITY CUSTOM HOMES NKA AFFINITY BUILDING GROUP

PATEL, KUNTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HYATT, JOEL

 

Court Documents

MOTION - FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT

11/23/2020: MOTION - FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AFFINITY CUSTOM HOMES LLC NKA AFFINITY BUILDING GROUP LLC - ISSUED 10/15/2020

10/14/2020: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AFFINITY CUSTOM HOMES LLC NKA AFFINITY BUILDING GROUP LLC - ISSUED 10/15/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/14/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020143240)

10/14/2020: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020143240)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MJS ENTERPRISES OF FLORIDA LLC - ISSUED 10/15/2020

10/14/2020: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MJS ENTERPRISES OF FLORIDA LLC - ISSUED 10/15/2020

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

10/15/2020: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR. / 2020175324)

12/10/2020: DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR. / 2020175324)

SUMMONS SERVED - LARRY A SCHOOF JR

12/8/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - LARRY A SCHOOF JR

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GROWING GREEN LANDSCAPING SERVICES INC - ISSUED 10/15/2020

10/14/2020: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GROWING GREEN LANDSCAPING SERVICES INC - ISSUED 10/15/2020

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR. / 2020175324)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - LARRY A SCHOOF JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - AFFINITY CUSTOM HOMES LLC NKA AFFINITY BUILDING GROUP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketACTION: FORWARDED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT TO JUDGE'S DENKIN OFFICE VIA INTER OFFICE MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020081922

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $390.00 RECEIPT #2020081645

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020143240)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GROWING GREEN LANDSCAPING SERVICES INC - ISSUED 10/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERIGAS PROPANE - ISSUED 10/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MJS ENTERPRISES OF FLORIDA LLC - ISSUED 10/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANTS/OCCUPANTS - ISSUED 10/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- MICHAEL ST GERMAIN - ISSUED 10/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KUNTAL PATEL - ISSUED 10/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MAHESHKUMAR PATEL - ISSUED 10/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AFFINITY CUSTOM HOMES LLC NKA AFFINITY BUILDING GROUP LLC - ISSUED 10/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Raymond Building Supply Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERIGAS PROPANE LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hyatt, Joel William