This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 00:36:09 (UTC).

RAGLE & COMPANY INC VS DOROSHENKO, LARYSA

Case Summary

On 02/05/2014 RAGLE COMPANY INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOROSHENKO, LARYSA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAGLE & COMPANY INC

Defendant

DOROSHENKO, LARYSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HANSON, ERIK

GREGG M. HOROWITZ PA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE -MEDIATION CONFERENCE

6/20/2014: NOTICE -MEDIATION CONFERENCE

COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL

6/4/2014: COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

10/14/2015: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

10/6/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE-FILING- MOTION

4/30/2014: NOTICE-FILING- MOTION

SUMMONS SERVED - LARYSA DOROSHENKO D/B/A EUROPEAN DELI

3/31/2014: SUMMONS SERVED - LARYSA DOROSHENKO D/B/A EUROPEAN DELI

ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT - ARYSA DOROSHENKO DBA EUROPEAN DELI

3/31/2014: ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT - ARYSA DOROSHENKO DBA EUROPEAN DELI

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LARYSA DOROSHENKOO DBA EUROPEAN DELI- ISSUED 2/6/2014

2/6/2014: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LARYSA DOROSHENKOO DBA EUROPEAN DELI- ISSUED 2/6/2014

PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2014080977

7/16/2014: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2014080977

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2015
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 12/22/2015 AT 11:00 AM IN H , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDERED MEDIATION REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2014083741

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AMENDED -AFFIDAVIT OF VANESSA PROX IN SUPPORT OF MOTION SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2014080977

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE -MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - TO COMPLAINT - ARYSA DOROSHENKO DBA EUROPEAN DELI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2014014758

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2014014727

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LARYSA DOROSHENKOO DBA EUROPEAN DELI- ISSUED 2/6/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$430.00; Amount Paid:$430.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/05/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000718 SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREGG MARTIN HOROWITZ