This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/25/2022 at 21:02:42 (UTC).

PRUTER, WILLIAM R

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 PRUTER, WILLIAM R was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

PRUTER, WILLIAM R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

FERRARI, JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketORDER - REGARING THE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT AND FILING OF WARDS DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketORDER FOR COMPENSATION OF EXAMINING COMMITTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP PLENARY FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022031942)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022031941)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - BY ELISOR OF NOTICE AND PETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY AND PETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT & ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - TELEPHONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY - AND FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketORDER - COUNSEL FOR ALLEGED INCAPACITATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022006264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR GUARDIAN - PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN LOUIS FERRARI JR